Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentín Ampuero Núñez, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Puno


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Feb 1869BornPuquina
1894²24.9Ordained PriestPriest of Arequipa, Peru
1898²28.9ProfessedPriest of Congregation of the Mission
9 Jan 190939.9SelectedBishop of Puno, Peru
16 Mar 190940.1ConfirmedBishop of Puno, Peru
19 Sep 190940.6Ordained BishopBishop of Puno, Peru
30 Sep 190940.6InstalledBishop of Puno, Peru
2 Dec 191445.8DiedBishop of Puno, Peru

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Valentín Ampuero Núñez:
Bishop Valentín Ampuero Núñez C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Puno

  • a priest for 20.9 years
  • a bishop for 5.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1913
  • b: LB, 6 Feb 2013
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 314
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 61

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013