Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Vásquez, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Panamá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1804¹Born
20 Dec 185349.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Panamá
20 Dec 185349.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lambaesis
17 Aug 185551.6AppointedBishop of Panamá
23 Dec 185551.9Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
3 Jan 187066.0DiedBishop of Panamá

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Vásquez (VIAF: 89444627)
Bishop Eduardo Vásquez O.P. (born 1804, died ) Bishop of Panamá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTunja
Ordained BishopDominican Church, Bogota, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 331, and Page 437
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 57

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Feb 2017