Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos Bermúdez

Deceased

Bishop of Popayán, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Nov 1827Born
13 Mar 186840.3AppointedBishop of Popayán, Colombia
28 Jun 186840.6Ordained BishopBishop of Popayán, Colombia
6 Dec 188659.0DiedBishop of Popayán, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Carlos Bermúdez
Bishop Carlos Bermúdez (born , died ) Bishop of Popayán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogota, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bogota, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a bishop for 18.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 463
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1868, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017