Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joaquín Larraín Gandarillas

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

Titular Archbishop of Anazarbus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1822BornSantiago
20 Mar 184724.4Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
31 Dec 187755.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
31 Dec 187755.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Martyropolis
1 Mar 187855.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Martyropolis
15 Jun 189370.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Anazarbus
26 Sep 189775.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

MicroData Summary for Joaquín Larraín Gandarillas:
Archbishop Joaquín Larraín Gandarillas (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 50.5 years
  • a bishop for 19.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 99, and Page 371

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013