Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Enrique Izquierdo Vargas

Deceased

Bishop of Concepción, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Jan 1861Born
22 Dec 188322.9Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
29 Jan 190645.0AppointedBishop of Concepción, Chile
25 Mar 190645.1Ordained BishopBishop of Concepción, Chile
7 Apr 190645.2InstalledBishop of Concepción, Chile
7 Aug 191756.5DiedBishop of Concepción, Chile

MicroData Summary for Luis Enrique Izquierdo Vargas
Bishop Luis Enrique Izquierdo Vargas (born , died ) Bishop of Concepción

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 33.6 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1906, Number 23
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 138
  • c1/i: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017