Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luís Silva Lezaeta

Deceased

Bishop of Antofagasta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Feb 1860BornTunca
22 Dec 188222.9Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
15 May 188727.3AppointedVicar Apostolic of Antofagasta, Chile
1896²35.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Antofagasta, Chile
4 Nov 190444.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Antofagasta, Chile
10 Feb 190545.0InstalledVicar Apostolic of Antofagasta, Chile
5 Jan 191251.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Olena
28 Apr 191252.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Olena
3 Feb 192868.0AppointedBishop of Antofagasta, Chile
3 May 192868.3InstalledBishop of Antofagasta, Chile
21 May 192969.3DiedBishop of Antofagasta, Chile

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luís Silva Lezaeta:
Bishop Luís Silva Lezaeta (born , died ) Bishop of Antofagasta

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 29

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013