Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Antofagasta

Archidioecesis Antofagastensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 28 June 1967
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Chile
  • Square Kilometers: 84,506 (32,640 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.iglesiadeantofagasta.cl/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, San Martin 2634, Antofagasta, Chile
  • Telephone: (055)556.774
  • Fax: 556.788

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Antofagasta
1881ErectedMission "Sui Iuris" of Antofagasta (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Antofagasta
1887ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Antofagasta Vicariate Apostolic of Antofagasta
Diocese of Antofagasta
3 February 1928ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Antofagasta Diocese of Antofagasta
21 July 1965Territory LostDiocese of Antofagasta
Diocese of Iquique
Territorial Prelature of Calama (erected)
Archdiocese of Antofagasta
28 June 1967ElevatedDiocese of Antofagasta Archdiocese of Antofagasta

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Antofagasta
1950165,000180,00091.7%721285,892316123ap1951
1959201,871266,87175.6%1637533,808489727ap1960
1966212,500192,740110.3%1635514,1663511616ap1967
Archdiocese of Antofagasta
1968164,000192,74085.1%1830483,416349913ap1971
1976245,000280,00087.5%332357,0006336017ap1977
1980200,000215,80092.7%425296,8966266017ap1981
1990230,000245,00093.9%1219317,4197278618ap1991
1999174,360249,08570.0%1424384,58811289717ap2000
2000294,891317,08793.0%1625417,19216288317ap2001
2001294,891317,08793.0%1725427,02116288317ap2002
2002245,257350,36770.0%1427415,98118307417ap2003
2003243,558347,93970.0%1429435,66417328619ap2004
2004258,972361,13871.7%1438524,98017419119ap2005
2006239,359341,94270.0%1527425,69917299019ap2007
2012252,300362,00069.7%1825435,86734308419ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 25 Feb 2014