Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francisco de Borja Valenzuela Ríos

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Valparaíso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Oct 1917BornBuin
18 Sep 194325.9Ordained PriestPriest of Rancagua, Chile
27 Jun 195537.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Copiapó, Chile
27 Aug 195537.9InstalledApostolic Administrator of Copiapó, Chile
24 May 195638.6AppointedPrelate of Copiapó, Chile
24 May 195638.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Aegeae
15 Jul 195638.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aegeae
20 Aug 195739.9AppointedBishop of Antofagasta, Chile
12 Oct 195740.0InstalledBishop of Antofagasta, Chile
21 Jul 196547.8AppointedAdministrator of Calama, Chile
28 Jun 196749.7AppointedArchbishop of Antofagasta, Chile
20 Aug 196749.9InstalledArchbishop of Antofagasta, Chile
19 May 196850.6ResignedAdministrator of Calama, Chile
Apr 197052.5AppointedAdministrator of Calama, Chile
2 Jun 197052.6ResignedAdministrator of Calama, Chile
25 Mar 197456.5AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of San Felipe, Chile
5 May 197456.6InstalledBishop of San Felipe, Chile
3 May 198365.6AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Valparaíso, Chile
16 Apr 199375.5RetiredBishop of Valparaíso, Chile
20 Feb 199880.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Valparaíso, Chile

MicroData Summary for Francisco de Borja Valenzuela Ríos:
Archbishop Francisco de Borja Valenzuela Ríos (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Valparaíso

  • a priest for 54.4 years
  • a bishop for 41.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • ob/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1956, Number 65
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013