Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alejandro Durán Moreira

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rancagua


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Dec 1914BornSan Bernardo
7 Dec 193824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Rancagua, Chile
17 Apr 195944.3AppointedBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
11 Jun 195944.5Ordained BishopBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
21 Jun 195944.5InstalledBishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
31 Mar 196651.3AppointedBishop of Los Angeles, Chile
18 Jun 196651.5InstalledBishop of Los Angeles, Chile
2 Feb 197055.1AppointedBishop of Rancagua, Chile
20 Mar 197055.3InstalledBishop of Rancagua, Chile
30 May 198671.4ResignedBishop of Rancagua, Chile
19 Apr 200388.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Rancagua, Chile

MicroData Summary for Alejandro Durán Moreira:
Bishop Alejandro Durán Moreira (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rancagua

  • a priest for 64.4 years
  • a bishop for 43.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 52
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013