Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Manuel Santos Ascarza, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile

Member of Order of Discalced Carmelites


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1916Born
7 Dec 193822.6Ordained PriestPriest of Valparaíso, Chile
21 Sep 195539.4AppointedBishop of Valdivia, Chile
4 Dec 195539.6Ordained BishopBishop of Valdivia, Chile
12 Dec 195539.6InstalledBishop of Valdivia, Chile
3 May 198367.0AppointedArchbishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
17 Jun 198367.2InstalledArchbishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
29 Jul 198872.3ResignedArchbishop of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile
24 Mar 199073.9ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
14 Sep 200791.4DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Concepción (Santissima Concezione), Chile

MicroData Summary for José Manuel Santos Ascarza (VIAF: 77990978)
Archbishop José Manuel Santos Ascarza O.C.D. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Concepción (Santissima Concezione)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLlay-Llay
Ordained PriestRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 68.7 years
  • a bishop for 51.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1955, Number 111
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • c1: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017