Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolfo Rodríguez Vidal

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jul 1920BornTarragona
25 Apr 194827.8Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
6 Jul 198868.0AppointedBishop of Los Angeles, Chile
28 Aug 198868.1Ordained BishopBishop of Los Angeles, Chile
19 Feb 199473.6ResignedBishop of Los Angeles, Chile
8 Nov 200383.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Los Angeles, Chile

MicroData Summary for Adolfo Rodríguez Vidal:
Bishop Adolfo Rodríguez Vidal (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Los Angeles

  • a priest for 55.5 years
  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 116, Number 10,340
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 21 Nov 2014