Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis Gleisner Wobbe

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of La Serena, Chile

Titular Bishop of Mididi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1936 Born
11 Aug 196327.4Ordained PriestPriest of Opus Dei
3 Jul 199155.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rancagua, Chile
3 Jul 199155.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mididi
15 Aug 199155.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mididi
10 Jul 200165.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of La Serena, Chile
21 Nov 201478.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of La Serena, Chile

MicroData Summary for Luis Gleisner Wobbe
Bishop Luis Gleisner Wobbe (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of La Serena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIquique
Ordained PriestMadrid, Diocese of Madrid, Spain

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of La Serena.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 127, Number 11,464
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2014
  • opl: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Apr 2017