Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Puerto Montt

Archidioecesis Portus Montt



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 10 May 1963
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Chile
  • Square Kilometers: 18,205 (7,031 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arzobispadodepuertomontt.cl/
  • Mailing Address: Casilla 17, Calle Benavente 385, Puerto Montt, Chile
  • Telephone: (065)25.23.67
  • Fax: 25.17.33

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Puerto Montt
1 April 1939ErectedDiocese of San Carlos de Ancud Diocese of Puerto Montt (erected)
Archdiocese of Puerto Montt
15 November 1955Territory LostArchdiocese of Puerto Montt
Diocese of Valdivia
Diocese of Osorno (erected)
10 May 1963ElevatedDiocese of Puerto Montt Archdiocese of Puerto Montt

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Puerto Montt
1949134,000140,00095.7%2428522,576269619ap1951
Archdiocese of Puerto Montt
1966162,000198,00081.8%3426602,7003312123ap1967
1970170,000200,00085.0%2027473,6173512026ap1971
1976196,000230,00085.2%1824424,66692911928ap1977
1980204,000240,00085.0%1721385,368122811528ap1981
1990222,000255,00087.1%2721484,6258269523ap1991
1999249,000296,00084.1%2820485,18716236229ap2000
2000235,000300,00078.3%3621574,12216246229ap2001
2001235,000300,00078.3%3923623,79017266431ap2002
2002230,000300,00076.7%3524593,89818276431ap2003
2003290,000329,76687.9%3324575,08718276431ap2004
2004235,097329,77671.3%3525603,91817296531ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.0, 29 Jul 2012; data: 19 Aug 2012