Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Alberto Rencoret Donoso

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Puerto Montt


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1907BornTalca
15 Aug 193931.8Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
21 Mar 195850.4AppointedBishop of Puerto Montt, Chile
1 Jun 195850.6Ordained BishopBishop of Puerto Montt, Chile
10 May 196355.5AppointedArchbishop of Puerto Montt, Chile
18 May 197062.5ResignedArchbishop of Puerto Montt, Chile
18 May 197062.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Sila
26 Feb 197668.3ResignedTitular Archbishop of Sila
25 Jul 197870.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Puerto Montt, Chile

MicroData Summary for Alberto Rencoret Donoso:
Archbishop Alberto Rencoret Donoso (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Puerto Montt

  • a priest for 38.9 years
  • a bishop for 20.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 115, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013