Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Emilio Tagle Covarrubias

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Valparaíso, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Aug 1907Born
20 Dec 193023.3Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
10 Jan 195850.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
10 Jan 195850.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Arethusa
16 Mar 195850.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arethusa
12 Mar 195951.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Santiago de Chile
12 Mar 195951.5AppointedTitular Archbishop of Nicopolis ad Nestum
5 Apr 195951.6InstalledApostolic Administrator of Santiago de Chile
22 May 196153.7AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Valparaíso, Chile
25 Jun 196153.8InstalledBishop of Valparaíso, Chile
3 May 198375.7RetiredBishop of Valparaíso, Chile
5 Sep 199184.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Valparaíso, Chile

MicroData Summary for Emilio Tagle Covarrubias (VIAF: 55827385)
Archbishop Emilio Tagle Covarrubias (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Valparaíso

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago de Chile, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopSeminary, Chapel, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • b: CB, 10 Apr 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Apr 2017