Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Santiago Jaime Silva Retamales

Bishop of Valdivia, Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1955 Born
24 Oct 198025.3Ordained PriestPriest of Valparaíso, Chile
16 Feb 200246.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Valparaíso, Chile
16 Feb 200246.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bela
6 Apr 200246.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bela
7 Jul 201560.0AppointedBishop of Chile, Military
23 Dec 202065.5AppointedBishop of Valdivia, Chile
19 Mar 202165.7InstalledBishop of Valdivia, Chile

MicroData Summary for Santiago Jaime Silva Retamales
Bishop Santiago Jaime Silva Retamales (born ) Bishop of Valdivia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Calera, Diocese of Valparaíso
Ordained BishopCathedral, Valparaíso, Diocese of Valparaíso

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Valdivia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 167, Number 14,162
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Jul 2015
  • c1: CB, 13 May 2018
  • ab: Bollettino, 23 Dec 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 19 Mar 2021

Quantcast