Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Valdivia

Dioecesis Valdiviensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Mission "Sui Iuris" of Valdivia
14 June 1910ErectedDiocese of San Carlos de Ancud Mission "Sui Iuris" of Valdivia (erected)
Apostolic Administration of Valdivia
25 September 1924ElevatedMission "Sui Iuris" of Valdivia Apostolic Administration of Valdivia
Diocese of Valdivia
8 July 1944ElevatedApostolic Administration of Valdivia Diocese of Valdivia
15 November 1955Territory LostArchdiocese of Puerto Montt
Diocese of Valdivia
Diocese of Osorno (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Valdivia
1950224,235257,39587.1%1844623,6165012123ap1951
1964200,000225,00088.9%1924434,651308813ap1967
1968204,120231,95588.0%1423375,516278312ap1971
1976206,396233,97788.2%1122336,254237418ap1977
1980221,661251,28288.2%1124356,333357318ap1981
1990269,035300,32489.6%1623396,898265523ap1991
1999219,000275,00079.6%1419336,63618236518ap2000
2000222,000279,00079.6%1218307,40019226818ap2001
2001212,000267,00079.4%1321346,23519237419ap2002
2002214,000269,00079.6%1321346,29419237019ap2003
2003214,000267,00080.1%1321346,29419237219ap2004
2004226,487282,58080.1%1321346,66119237219ap2005
2010237,000297,00079.8%1714317,64525155217ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_d, v3.0.1, 5 Oct 2014; Data: 7 Oct 2014