Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augusto Klinke Leier

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Valdivia

Titular Bishop of Proconnesus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Mar 1870BornBraddorf, Austria
23 Jun 189323.3Ordained PriestPriest of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
11 Nov 190838.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Carlos de Ancud, Chile
11 Nov 190838.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Proconnesus
21 Feb 190938.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Proconnesus
19 Jun 191040.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Valdivia, Chile
25 Sep 192454.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Valdivia, Chile
27 Apr 192555.1InstalledApostolic Administrator of Valdivia, Chile
14 Nov 192858.6ResignedApostolic Administrator of Valdivia, Chile
8 Apr 193262.0DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Valdivia, Chile

MicroData Summary for Augusto Klinke Leier:
Bishop Augusto Klinke Leier (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Valdivia

  • a priest for 38.7 years
  • a bishop for 23.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015