Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Mariano Santiago Casanova y Casanova

Deceased

Archbishop of Santiago de Chile


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jul 1833Born
20 Sep 185623.1Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
2 Nov 187239.2AppointedVicar General of Valparaíso, Chile
1885¹51.4ResignedVicar General of Valparaíso, Chile
3 Dec 188653.3AppointedArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
30 Jan 188753.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Santiago de Chile
16 May 190874.8DiedArchbishop of Santiago de Chile

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Mariano Santiago Casanova y Casanova (VIAF: 87289318)
Archbishop Mariano Santiago Casanova y Casanova (born , died ) Archbishop of Santiago de Chile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopCathedral, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Death PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Buried Place (Original)Crypt, Cathedral, Santiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 51.6 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 314
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 29 Nov 1895
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1887, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 23 May 2017