Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rafael Fernández Concha

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

Titular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1833BornSantiago
8 Jan 186026.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Santiago de Chile
15 Jan 186026.2Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
22 Jan 190167.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
22 Jan 190167.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
2 Jun 190167.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
13 Oct 191279.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

MicroData Summary for Rafael Fernández Concha:
Bishop Rafael Fernández Concha (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 11.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 261
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1901, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013