Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Ramón Astorga Salinas

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

Titular Bishop of Martyropolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1831Born
10 Jun 185423.0Ordained PriestPriest of Santiago de Chile
22 Jun 189968.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile
22 Jun 189968.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Martyropolis
28 Oct 189968.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Martyropolis
1 Dec 190675.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

MicroData Summary for José Ramón Astorga Salinas (VIAF: 260175025)
Bishop José Ramón Astorga Salinas (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Chile

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Ordained BishopSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile
Death PlaceSantiago, Archdiocese of Santiago de Chile

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1,901
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 371
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,899, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast