Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto Maria del Pozo y Martin, S.J. †

Deceased

Bishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Aug 1836Born
13 Nov 188448.2AppointedBishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
15 Feb 188548.4Ordained BishopBishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador
3 May 191275.6DiedBishop of Guayaquil, Ecuador

MicroData Summary for Roberto Maria del Pozo y Martin
Bishop Roberto Maria del Pozo y Martin S.J. (born , died ) Bishop of Guayaquil

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIbarra
Ordained BishopCathedral, Panama, Diocese of Panamá

  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 296
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Jun 2017