Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernardo Agusto Thiel Hoffman, C.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of San José de Costa Rica


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Apr 1850Born
20 Dec 187323.7Ordained DeaconDeacon of Congregation of the Mission
7 Jun 187424.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Mission
27 Feb 188029.9AppointedBishop of San José de Costa Rica
5 Sep 188030.4Ordained BishopBishop of San José de Costa Rica
9 Sep 190151.4DiedBishop of San José de Costa Rica

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Agusto Thiel Hoffman (VIAF: 78106853)
Bishop Bernardo Agusto Thiel Hoffman C.M. (born , died ) Bishop of San José de Costa Rica

EventPlace
Birth PlaceElberfeld, Archdiocese of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
Ordained BishopCathedral, San José, Diocese of San José de Costa Rica

  • a priest for 27.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 324
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1880, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 May 2017