Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Telésphor Paúl y Vargas, S.J. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jan 1831Born
5 Dec 185524.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
17 Sep 187544.6AppointedBishop of Panamá
5 Mar 187645.1Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
6 Aug 188453.5AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
14 Nov 188453.8InstalledArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
8 Apr 188958.2DiedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Telésphor Paúl y Vargas (VIAF: 23372289)
Archbishop José Telésphor Paúl y Vargas S.J. (born , died ) Archbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSantafé, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada
Ordained BishopCathedral, Panama, Diocese of Panamá

  • a priest for 33.3 years
  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 271, and Page 437
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017