Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ignacio Antonio Parra

Deceased

Bishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1824Born
21 Mar 187046.2AppointedBishop of Panamá
16 Apr 187147.2Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
3 Jun 187147.4InstalledBishop of Panamá
19 Aug 1875³51.6ResignedBishop of Panamá
17 Sep 187551.7AppointedBishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
8 Jun 187652.4InstalledBishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
21 Feb 190884.1DiedBishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ignacio Antonio Parra
Bishop Ignacio Antonio Parra (born , died ) Bishop of Nueva Pamplona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTunja, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bogota, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a bishop for 36.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 407, and Page 437
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1871, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017