Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jose Alejandro Peralta

Deceased

Bishop of Panamá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1846Born
5 Mar 187124.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
12 Mar 187124.8Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jun 188640.0AppointedBishop of Panamá
24 Oct 188640.4Ordained BishopBishop of Panamá
29 Jan 188740.7InstalledBishop of Panamá
8 Jul 189953.1DiedBishop of Panamá

MicroData Summary for Jose Alejandro Peralta
Bishop Jose Alejandro Peralta (born , died ) Bishop of Panamá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNueva Pamplona, Diocese of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia

  • a priest for 28.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 437
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 51

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 27 May 2017