Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernabé Rojas, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Marta


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jan 1854AppointedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
14 Jan 1855Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia
13 Apr 1858DiedBishop of Santa Marta, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Bernabé Rojas:
Bishop Bernabé Rojas O.P. (died ) Bishop of Santa Marta

  • a bishop for 3.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 370

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013