Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domingo Antonio Riaño Martínez

Deceased

Bishop of Antioquía, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Dec 1785Born
Apr 1818³32.2Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jan 185468.0AppointedBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
25 Mar 185569.2Ordained BishopBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
20 Jul 186680.5DiedBishop of Antioquía, Colombia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domingo Antonio Riaño Martínez
Bishop Domingo Antonio Riaño Martínez (born , died ) Bishop of Antioquía

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogota, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bogota, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 110
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1855, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 30 Dec 2016