Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Cerón

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1825¹Born
1848²23.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Feb 187954.1AppointedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
17 Aug 187954.6Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena, Colombia
9 May 188055.3DiedBishop of Cartagena, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Cerón
Bishop Manuel Cerón (born 1825, died ) Bishop of Cartagena

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIza, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bogota, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a priest for 32.3 years
  • a bishop for .7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 186
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1879, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Mar 2017