Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bonifacio Antonio Toscano

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Centuria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jun 1810Born
4 Jun 184838.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Dec 186454.5AppointedBishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
15 Aug 186555.1Ordained BishopBishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
18 Nov 187363.4ResignedBishop of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia
16 Jan 187463.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Centuria
13 Aug 189686.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Nueva Pamplona, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Bonifacio Antonio Toscano
Bishop Bonifacio Antonio Toscano (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Nueva Pamplona

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNueva Pamplona
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bogota, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 30.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 195, and Page 407
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1865, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017