Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús María Rodríguez Balbín

Deceased

Bishop of Antioquía, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1836Born
15 Jan 186024.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Antioquía, Colombia
9 Dec 186024.9Ordained PriestPriest of Antioquía, Colombia
9 Aug 188347.5AppointedBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
21 Oct 188347.7Ordained BishopBishop of Antioquía, Colombia
30 Jul 189155.5DiedBishop of Antioquía, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Jesús María Rodríguez Balbín
Bishop Jesús María Rodríguez Balbín (born , died ) Bishop of Antioquía

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAntioquia, Diocese of Antioquía
Ordained BishopS. Dominique, Bogota, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a priest for 30.6 years
  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 110
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1883, Number 53

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017