Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Canuto Restrepo y Villegas

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Pasto, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jan 1825Born
1 Jan 184923.9Ordained PriestPriest
21 Mar 187045.1AppointedBishop of Pasto, Colombia
3 Apr 187045.2Ordained BishopBishop of Pasto, Colombia
1881¹55.9ResignedBishop of Pasto, Colombia
23 Oct 189166.7DiedBishop Emeritus of Pasto, Colombia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Canuto Restrepo y Villegas
Bishop Manuel Canuto Restrepo y Villegas (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Pasto

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAbejorral, Diocese of Medellín
Ordained BishopGesu, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 42.8 years
  • a bishop for 21.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1885
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 443
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1870, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 11 Apr 2017