Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Bernardo Herrera Restrepo

Deceased

Archbishop of Bogotá, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1844Born
19 Dec 186824.2Ordained DeaconDeacon of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
22 May 186924.6Ordained PriestPriest of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
27 Mar 188540.5AppointedBishop of Medellín, Colombia
27 Dec 188541.2Ordained BishopBishop of Medellín, Colombia
4 Jun 189146.7AppointedArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
13 Sep 189147.0InstalledArchbishop of Santafé en Nueva Granada, Colombia
2 Jan 192883.3DiedArchbishop of Bogotá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Bernardo Herrera Restrepo (VIAF: 24140843)
Archbishop Bernardo Herrera Restrepo (born , died ) Archbishop of Bogotá

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogotá, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bogotá, Archdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada

  • a priest for 58.6 years
  • a bishop for 42.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 271, and Page 375
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 88
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017