Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Maldonado Calvo

Deceased

Bishop of Tunja, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Sep 1860Born
19 Dec 188525.2Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
25 Jul 190544.8AppointedBishop of Tunja, Colombia
5 Nov 190545.1Ordained BishopBishop of Tunja, Colombia
5 Dec 190545.2InstalledBishop of Tunja, Colombia
31 Mar 193271.5DiedBishop of Tunja, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Maldonado Calvo
Bishop Eduardo Maldonado Calvo (born , died ) Bishop of Tunja

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBogotá

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • op/ob: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1905, Number 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018