Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Leonidas Medina

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Socorro y San Gil

Titular Archbishop of Novae Patrae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1854BornTuta
15 Oct 187622.3Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jan 191257.6AppointedBishop of Pasto, Colombia
29 Jun 191258.0Ordained BishopBishop of Pasto, Colombia
27 Mar 191661.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
27 Mar 191661.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Camachus
7 Mar 192368.7AppointedBishop of Socorro, Colombia
19 Jul 194793.1RetiredBishop of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia
19 Jul 194793.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Novae Patrae
25 Dec 195399.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Socorro y San Gil, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Leonidas Medina:
Archbishop Leonidas Medina (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Socorro y San Gil

  • a priest for 77.2 years
  • a bishop for 41.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 39
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013