Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ismael Perdomo Borrero

Deceased

Archbishop of Bogotá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1872BornEl-Gigante
19 Dec 189624.8Ordained PriestPriest of Garzón, Colombia
8 Jun 190331.3AppointedBishop of Ibagué, Colombia
19 Jun 190331.3Ordained BishopBishop of Ibagué, Colombia
5 Feb 192351.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Bogotá, Colombia
5 Feb 192351.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Traianopolis in Rhodope
2 Jan 192855.9SucceededArchbishop of Bogotá, Colombia
3 Jun 195078.3DiedArchbishop of Bogotá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Ismael Perdomo Borrero:
Archbishop Ismael Perdomo Borrero (born , died ) Archbishop of Bogotá

  • a priest for 53.5 years
  • a bishop for 47.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 317
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1903, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013