Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel 聲gel Builes G鏔ez

Deceased

Bishop of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Sep 1888Born
29 Nov 191426.2Ordained PriestPriest of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia
27 May 192435.7AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia
3 Aug 192435.9Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia
22 Oct 192436.1InstalledBishop of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia
29 Sep 197183.0DiedBishop of Santa Rosa de Osos, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Miguel 聲gel Builes G鏔ez (VIAF: 77225153)
Bishop Miguel 聲gel Builes G鏔ez (born , died ) Bishop of Santa Rosa de Osos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDonmat燰s
Ordained BishopCathedral, Bogot, Archdiocese of Bogot
Death PlaceMedell璯, Archdiocese of Medell璯
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Santa Rosa de Osos, Diocese of Santa Rosa de Osos

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 47.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations 夗iscopales, Year 1924, Number 48
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 1, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast