Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerardo Valencia Cano, M.X.Y. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Buenaventura

Titular Bishop of Rhesaina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Aug 1917BornSanto Domingo
29 Nov 194225.2Ordained PriestPriest of Misioneros Javerianos de Yarumal
19 Jul 194931.8AppointedPrefect of Mitú, Colombia
24 Mar 195335.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhesaina
24 Mar 195335.5AppointedVicar Apostolic of Buenaventura, Colombia
24 May 195335.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhesaina
21 Jan 197254.4DiedVicar Apostolic of Buenaventura, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Gerardo Valencia Cano:
Bishop Gerardo Valencia Cano M.X.Y. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Buenaventura

  • a priest for 29.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015