Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Ángel Rafael María de Santa Teresita del Nino Jesús Lecumberri Erburu, O.C.D. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tumaco, Colombia

Titular Bishop of Lambiridi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 May 1924Born
29 Jun 194824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
3 May 196641.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tumaco, Colombia
3 May 196641.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Lambiridi
31 Jul 196642.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lambiridi
8 Feb 199065.7ResignedVicar Apostolic of Tumaco, Colombia
14 Mar 200782.8DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tumaco, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Miguel Ángel Rafael María de Santa Teresita del Nino Jesús Lecumberri Erburu
Bishop Miguel Ángel Rafael María de Santa Teresita del Nino Jesús Lecumberri Erburu O.C.D. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Tumaco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArazuri, Spain

  • a priest for 58.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 131
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)
  • nm: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 3 Apr 2019

Quantcast