Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gustavo Girón Higuita, O.C.D.

Bishop Emeritus of Tumaco, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 May 1940 Born
8 Dec 195919.5ProfessedMember of Order of Discalced Carmelites
2 Dec 196727.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Discalced Carmelites
8 Feb 199049.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Tumaco, Colombia
8 Feb 199049.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Bisica
22 Apr 199049.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bisica
29 Oct 199959.4AppointedBishop of Tumaco, Colombia
25 Jul 201575.1RetiredBishop of Tumaco, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Gustavo Girón Higuita
Bishop Gustavo Girón Higuita O.C.D. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Tumaco

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMedellín, Archdiocese of Medellín
Ordained BishopEl Señor de las Miericorias, Church, Medellín, Archdiocese of Medellín

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tumaco.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 129, Number 11,589
  • r: Bollettino, 25 Jul 2015
  • prof/c1/loc: CB, 12 Jun 2022

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2022
Code: web_b, v3.3.3, 16 Jun 2022; Data: 9 Oct 2022