Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Angelo Acerbi

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Netherlands

Titular Archbishop of Zella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Sep 1925 Born
27 Mar 194822.5Ordained PriestPriest
22 Jun 197448.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Zella
22 Jun 197448.7AppointedApostolic Pro-Nuncio to New Zealand
22 Jun 197448.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Pacific Ocean
30 Jun 197448.7Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Zella
14 Aug 197953.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Colombia
28 Mar 199064.5AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Hungary
13 Jan 199468.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Moldova, Republic of
8 Feb 199771.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Netherlands
27 Feb 200175.4RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Netherlands

MicroData Summary for Angelo Acerbi
Archbishop Angelo Acerbi (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Netherlands

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSesta Godano
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Netherlands.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 24, Number 1,373

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Jun 2021

Quantcast