Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Ardila Serrano

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Girardot


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Sep 1925BornZapatoca
17 Oct 194823.0Ordained PriestPriest
27 Oct 198055.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
27 Oct 198055.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tisedi
30 Nov 198055.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tisedi
21 May 198862.6AppointedBishop of Girardot, Colombia
15 Jun 200175.7RetiredBishop of Girardot, Colombia
12 Oct 201085.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Girardot, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Jorge Ardila Serrano
Bishop Jorge Ardila Serrano (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Girardot

  • a priest for 61.9 years
  • a bishop for 29.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 16 Apr 2016