Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Guillermo Alvaro Ortiz Carrillo

Deceased

Bishop of Garagoa, Colombia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Dec 1924Born
6 Dec 195328.9Ordained PriestPriest of Bogotá, Colombia
3 May 198661.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
3 May 198661.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Pauzera
13 Jun 198661.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pauzera
16 Feb 198964.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Garagoa, Colombia
27 Dec 198965.0SucceededBishop of Garagoa, Colombia
24 Feb 200075.2DiedBishop of Garagoa, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Guillermo Alvaro Ortiz Carrillo
Bishop Guillermo Alvaro Ortiz Carrillo (born , died ) Bishop of Garagoa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFosca

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 13.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,604
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,239
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 143
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018