Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ramón Darío Molina Jaramillo, O.F.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Neiva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1935 BornEnvigado
26 Oct 196126.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
6 May 197741.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Bogotá, Colombia
6 May 197741.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Timici
29 Jun 197741.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Timici
23 Mar 198448.6AppointedBishop of Montería, Colombia
19 Jan 200165.4AppointedBishop of Neiva, Colombia
4 Feb 201276.4RetiredBishop of Neiva, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Ramón Darío Molina Jaramillo:
Bishop Ramón Darío Molina Jaramillo O.F.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Neiva

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Neiva.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 4 Feb 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013