Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eulises González Sánchez

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of San Andrés y Providencia

Titular Bishop of Tatilti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1938 BornTinjacá
22 Aug 196829.8Ordained PriestPriest of Girardot, Colombia
5 Dec 200062.1AppointedVicar Apostolic of San Andrés y Providencia, Colombia
5 Dec 200062.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Tatilti
10 Mar 200162.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tatilti
16 Apr 201677.4RetiredVicar Apostolic of San Andrés y Providencia, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Eulises González Sánchez
Bishop Eulises González Sánchez (born ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of San Andrés y Providencia

Please contact the Bishop through the Vicariate Apostolic of San Andrés y Providencia.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,924
  • r: Bollettino, 16 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 16 Apr 2016