Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jesús María Coronado Caro, S.D.B. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Duitama-Sogamoso


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1918BornCiénega
31 Aug 194729.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
16 Jan 196446.0AppointedPrefect of Ariari, Colombia
10 Feb 197355.1AppointedBishop of Girardot, Colombia
24 Mar 197355.2Ordained BishopBishop of Girardot, Colombia
30 Jul 198163.5AppointedBishop of Duitama, Colombia
21 Jun 199476.4RetiredBishop of Duitama-Sogamoso, Colombia
31 Dec 201093.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Duitama-Sogamoso, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Jesús María Coronado Caro:
Bishop Jesús María Coronado Caro S.D.B. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Duitama-Sogamoso

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 37.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013