Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alvaro Raúl Jarro Tobos

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Colombia, Military


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1930Born
8 Dec 195424.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jun 198453.7AppointedBishop of Chiquinquirá, Colombia
15 Aug 198453.9Ordained BishopBishop of Chiquinquirá, Colombia
24 Jun 199766.7AppointedBishop of Colombia, Military
24 Jun 199766.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Thasbalta
7 Mar 199867.5ResignedTitular Bishop of Thasbalta
19 Jan 200170.3ResignedBishop of Colombia, Military
11 Aug 200473.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Colombia, Military

MicroData Summary for Alvaro Raúl Jarro Tobos
Bishop Alvaro Raúl Jarro Tobos (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Colombia, Military

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNobsa

  • a priest for 49.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 15 Jun 2017