Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Vicente Huertas Vargas

Bishop of Garagoa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1940 BornRamiriqui
11 Feb 196726.8Ordained PriestPriest
23 Jun 200060.2AppointedBishop of Garagoa, Colombia
4 Aug 200060.3Ordained BishopBishop of Garagoa, Colombia

MicroData Summary for José Vicente Huertas Vargas:
Bishop José Vicente Huertas Vargas (born ) Bishop of Garagoa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Garagoa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 160, Number 13,812

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013