Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Misael Vacca Ramirez

Bishop of Duitama-Sogamoso

Apostolic Administrator of Málaga-Soatá


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Nov 1955 BornSomondoco
3 Dec 198328.0Ordained PriestPriest of Garagoa, Colombia
24 Apr 200145.4AppointedBishop of Yopal, Colombia
10 Aug 200145.7Ordained BishopBishop of Yopal, Colombia
18 Apr 201559.4AppointedBishop of Duitama-Sogamoso, Colombia
6 Jun 201559.5InstalledBishop of Duitama-Sogamoso, Colombia
15 Aug 201559.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Málaga-Soatá, Colombia

MicroData Summary for Misael Vacca Ramirez:
Bishop Misael Vacca Ramirez (born ) Bishop of Duitama-Sogamoso

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Duitama-Sogamoso.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 164, Number 14,013
  • ab: Bollettino, 18 Apr 2015
  • i: CB, 5 May 2015
  • ab: CB, 15 Aug 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.8, 27 Jul 2015; Data: 15 Aug 2015