Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Tunja

Archidioecesis Tunquensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 20 June 1964
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Colombia
  • Square Kilometers: 3,379 (1,305 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.arquidiocesisdetunja.org/
  • Mailing Address: Arzobispado, Calle 17 N. 9-85, Tunja, Boyaca, Colombia
  • Telephone: (8)742.20.94
  • Fax: 742.31.30

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Tunja
29 July 1880ErectedArchdiocese of Santafé en Nueva Granada Diocese of Tunja (erected)
17 July 1893Territory LostDiocese of Tunja Vicariate Apostolic of Casanare (erected)
7 March 1955Territory LostDiocese of Tunja Diocese of Duitama (erected)
Archdiocese of Tunja
20 June 1964ElevatedDiocese of Tunja Archdiocese of Tunja
26 April 1977Territory LostArchdiocese of Tunja Diocese of Chiquinquirá (erected)
26 April 1977Territory LostArchdiocese of Tunja Diocese of Garagoa (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Tunja
1950900,000900,000100.0%163692323,879244334110ap1951
Archdiocese of Tunja
1966609,950612,20099.6%159492082,9328442185ap1967
1970598,039598,039100.0%146441903,1477928687ap1971
1976700,000720,00097.2%157442013,4827141293ap1977
1980317,988321,20099.0%7221933,4193814742ap1981
1990360,000400,00090.0%8414983,67322111642ap1991
1999300,000340,00088.2%111161272,36231815651ap2000
2000280,000320,00087.5%112161282,18731715652ap2001
2001300,000340,00088.2%102161182,54231715452ap2002
2002300,000340,00088.2%106201262,38032115652ap2003
2003240,000281,50085.3%119211401,71432415153ap2004
2004260,000300,00086.7%115281431,81835413754ap2005
2010237,000278,00085.3%121221431,65794410656ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.8.9, 26 Feb 2013; data: 5 Jun 2013